AZ SB1467 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

STOs; corporations; caps; scholarship eligibility

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STOs; corporations; caps; scholarship eligibility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-03-14HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-03-05HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-01HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-01HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2018-03-01HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-01HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2018-02-28SenateSenate motion to amend
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-07SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2018-01-31SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431183Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431184Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431505Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70673
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1467p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1467s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1467yarbrough0832.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1467farley1048.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1467rules.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70673&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70673&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70673&billStatusActionId=182106&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70673&billStatusActionId=182113&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70673&billStatusActionId=182125&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70673&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70673&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback