AZ SB1466 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Chapter 180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Family caregiver grant program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family caregiver grant program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05SenateChapter 180
2021-04-05SenateGovernor Signed
2021-03-30SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-03-29SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-03-29HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0)
2021-03-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-22HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-03-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2021-03-15HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-03HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-02-18HouseTransmit to House
2021-02-18SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2021-02-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-02-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-10SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0)
2021-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2021-01-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
46341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
46342Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75536
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1466p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1466s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0180.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483563
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486973
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487261
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488457
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75536&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75536&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75536&billStatusActionId=201101&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75536&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75536&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75536&billStatusActionId=203433&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback