AZ SB1463 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Senate Conference Committee recommended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Licensure; requirements; psychologists

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensure; requirements; psychologists

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-10SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-10SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-09HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-5-0)
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-04-03HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-03HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-02HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-04-02HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-28HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2018-03-21HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-03-13HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-12HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-07HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-07SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-03-07SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-05SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-15SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0)
2018-01-31SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2018-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12531New CodeSee Bill Text
12532New CodeSee Bill Text
322071.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70664
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1463p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1463s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1463h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1463brophy mcgee1108.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1463cobb.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1463appropriations.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70664&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70664&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70664&billStatusActionId=182339&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70664&billStatusActionId=182344&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70664&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70664&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70664&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70664&billStatusActionId=183113&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70664&billStatusActionId=183164&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback