AZ SB1460 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Chapter 195
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Used catalytic converter; purchase; sale

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Used catalytic converter; purchase; sale

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-23 Chapter 195
2014-04-23 Governor Signed
2014-04-21 Transmitted to Governor
2014-04-17HouseTransmit to Senate
2014-04-17HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2014-04-02HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2014-04-01HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-01HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-01HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0)
2014-03-10HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-03-20HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-2-0)
2014-03-11HouseReferred to House JUD Committee
2014-03-11HouseHouse read second time
2014-03-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-03-10HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2014-03-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2014-02-28SenateTransmit to House
2014-02-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2014-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2014-02-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-26SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2014-02-05SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-02-10SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0)
2014-02-05SenateReferred to Senate JUD Committee
2014-02-05SenateSenate read second time
2014-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2014-02-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback