AZ SB1456 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School finance revisions
Title
School finance revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Governor Signed | |
2012-05-03 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-30 | Senate final reading , voting: (24-6-0-0) | |
2012-04-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-02 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-04-02 | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-4-0-0) | |
2012-03-21 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2012-03-20 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-20 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-12 | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-06 | Referred to House ED Committee | |
2012-03-06 | House read second time | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to House ED Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-03-01 | Transmit to House | |
2012-03-01 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Consent Calendar February 27, 2012 @ 1:19 PM | |
2012-02-28 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-27 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-23 | Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |