AZ SB1452 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona empowerment scholarships accounts; revisions
Title
Arizona empowerment scholarships accounts; revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Motion Senate request the House of Representatives return SB 1452, which was passed by the Senate and transmitted to the House of Representatives on February 15, 2021 for the purpose of reconsideration. Motion carried. (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Motion Senate request the House of Representatives return SB 1452, which was passed by the Senate and transmitted to the House of Representatives on February 15, 2021 for the purpose of reconsideration. Motion carried. (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-05-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-05-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-17 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: Senator Ugenti-Rita moved that the Senate request the House of Representatives return SB 1452, which was passed by the Senate and transmitted to the House of Representatives on February 15, 2021 for the purpose of reconsideration. Motion carried., voting: (20-10-0-0) |
2021-02-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Empowerment Scholarship Accounts
Classroom Site Fund
Definitions
Department Of Education
Education - Title 15
Expenditure
Fiscal Year 2021-2022
Fund (h)
Funding
National School Lunch And Child Nutrition Act
Per Pupil Funding Calculation
Public Transportation
Qualifying Tax Rate
Recalculation
Retroactivity
Revisions
State Government - Title 41
Tax
Tax Levies
Classroom Site Fund
Definitions
Department Of Education
Education - Title 15
Expenditure
Fiscal Year 2021-2022
Fund (h)
Funding
National School Lunch And Child Nutrition Act
Per Pupil Funding Calculation
Public Transportation
Qualifying Tax Rate
Recalculation
Retroactivity
Revisions
State Government - Title 41
Tax
Tax Levies
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 2402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 2403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 992 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1092.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |