AZ SB1441 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Chapter 190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Insurers; health providers; claims arbitration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurers; health providers; claims arbitration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24SenateChapter 190
2017-04-24SenateGovernor Signed
2017-04-20SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-04-20SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (26-4-0-0)
2017-04-20SenateSenate concurs
2017-04-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2017-04-20SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2017-04-19SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-04-19HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (40-19-0-0)
2017-04-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-03-28HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-28HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-27HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-03-20HouseHouse BI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-1-0-0)
2017-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2017-03-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-03-02HouseAssigned to House BI Committee
2017-03-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-03-01HouseTransmit to House
2017-03-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (25-5-0-0)
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-15SenateSenate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
203101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
203102Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69285
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1441p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1441s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1441h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0190.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1441fann.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1441fann3.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1441fin.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1441rules.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1441floorlesko.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.1441livingston.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.1441livingston2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.1441banking and insurance.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69285&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69285&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69285&billStatusActionId=176093&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69285&billStatusActionId=176188&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69285&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69285&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69285&billStatusActionId=177081&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69285&billStatusActionId=177084&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69285&billStatusActionId=177107&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69285&billStatusActionId=177111&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback