AZ SB1436 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibition; criminal history; occupational regulation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibition; criminal history; occupational regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateChapter 193
2018-04-11SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-09SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-09SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0)
2018-04-09SenateSenate concurs
2018-04-09SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-05HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2018-04-05HouseHouse motion to reconsider third reading
2018-04-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-2-0-0)
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-04-03HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-03HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-02HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-04-02HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-21HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2018-03-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-01HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0)
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-12SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0)
2018-01-31SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
13904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411093.04New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70625
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1436p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1436s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1436h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0193.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1436rules.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1436farnsworth e.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1436judiciary and public safety.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70625&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70625&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70625&billStatusActionId=182105&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70625&billStatusActionId=182213&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70625&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70625&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70625&billStatusActionId=182966&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70625&billStatusActionId=182982&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70625&billStatusActionId=183035&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70625&billStatusActionId=183037&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70625&billStatusActionId=183146&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70625&billStatusActionId=183131&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback