AZ SB1435 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public entity liability; sexual offenses
Title
Public entity liability; sexual offenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that the House suspend Rule 32, and notwithstanding any other House Rule that SB1435 be placed under the order of business for Third Reading of bills today. Passed by vv. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that the House suspend Rule 32, and notwithstanding any other House Rule that SB1435 be placed under the order of business for Third Reading of bills today. Passed by vv. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-04-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-21-2-0) |
2024-04-04 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Biasiucci that the House suspend Rule 32, and notwithstanding any other House Rule that SB1435 be placed under the order of business for Third Reading of bills today. Passed by vv. |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-20 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-18 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-12 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-9-2-0) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Applicability
Child With A Disability
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Effective Date
Minor
Other Immunities
Public Entity Liability
Sexual Offenses
Special Actions
Child With A Disability
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Effective Date
Minor
Other Immunities
Public Entity Liability
Sexual Offenses
Special Actions