AZ SB1433 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-21 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-21 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Employer liability; COVID-19 vaccine requirement
Title
Employer liability; COVID-19 vaccine requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (3-2-2-0) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Civil Action
Civil Liability
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Covid-19 Vaccine Requirement
Damages
Employer Liability
Civil Liability
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Covid-19 Vaccine Requirement
Damages
Employer Liability