AZ SB1433 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - House Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (25-28-6-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - House Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (25-28-6-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cities; towns; police functions; revocation
Title
Cities; towns; police functions; revocation
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Gould [R] | Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (Y: 25 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | House Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (25-28-6-0) | |
2012-04-17 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-17 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-16 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-15 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-02 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2012-03-02 | House read second time | |
2012-03-01 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-27 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-27 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-13 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |