AZ SB1431 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation HB2394

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Chapter 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Empowerment scholarships; expansion; phase-in

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Empowerment scholarships; expansion; phase-in

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06SenateChapter 139
2017-04-06SenateGovernor Signed
2017-04-06SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-04-06SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-04-06HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
2017-04-06HouseTransmit to House
2017-04-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0)
2017-04-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-13SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-02-13SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-09SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2017-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2394 (Replaces) 2017-04-06 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152402Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69282
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1431p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1431s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0139.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1431bradley.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1431floorworsley2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1431bradley0149.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69282&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69282&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69282&billStatusActionId=176870&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69282&billStatusActionId=176871&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69282&billStatusActionId=176873&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback