AZ SB1413 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Municipalities; annexation; roadway maintenance
Title
Municipalities; annexation; roadway maintenance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Chapter 86 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0) |
2017-03-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-03-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-08 | House | House LIA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Assigned to House LIA Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |