AZ SB1413 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Chapter 165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Chapter 165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fiduciary access to digital assets.
Title
Fiduciary access to digital assets.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Driggs [R] | Sen. Bob Worsley [R] | Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Sen. Carlyle Begay [R] |
Sen. Don Shooter [R] | Rep. Heather Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Banking and Financial Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Banking and Financial Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Chapter 165 | |
2016-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-1-6-0) |
2016-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0) |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-15 | House | House BFS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred to House BFS Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | Assigned to House BFS Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |