AZ SB1413 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Taxes; manufacturers' electricity sales; exemption
Title
Taxes; manufacturers' electricity sales; exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-11 | Chapter 7 | |
2014-04-11 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-08 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-08 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-3-6-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | House read second time |
2014-03-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-0-5-0) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |