AZ SB1409 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

TPT; prime contracting; alteration; replacement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TPT; prime contracting; alteration; replacement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateGovernor Signed
2018-05-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-03SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0)
2018-05-03SenateSenate concurs
2018-05-03SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-05-03SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-05-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-05-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2018-05-02HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-04-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-04-03HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-03HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-02HouseHouse RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-1-0-0)
2018-03-21HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
2018-03-01HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-28HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-27HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-14SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-1-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
425075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
426004Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70577
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1409p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1409s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1409h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0341.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.14090351.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1409fin.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1409rules.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1409fann0147.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1409kern.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1409weninger1.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1409ways and means.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1409rules.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70577&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70577&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70577&billStatusActionId=181768&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70577&billStatusActionId=181932&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70577&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70577&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70577&billStatusActionId=183422&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70577&billStatusActionId=183534&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70577&billStatusActionId=183647&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70577&billStatusActionId=183738&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70577&billStatusActionId=183752&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback