AZ SB1401 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Ignition interlock device; installer; manufacturer

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ignition interlock device; installer; manufacturer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateChapter 105
2018-03-29SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-28SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-27SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-27HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2018-03-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-19HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-07HouseHouse TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House TI Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-15HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-15SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2018-02-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-02-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-06SenateSenate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
281301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
281461Amended CodeSee Bill Text
281462Amended CodeSee Bill Text
281464Amended CodeSee Bill Text
281467Amended CodeSee Bill Text
281468Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70568
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1401p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1401s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0105.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70568&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70568&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70568&billStatusActionId=180891&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70568&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70568&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70568&billStatusActionId=182707&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback