AZ SB1397 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Registrar of contractors omnibus

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registrar of contractors omnibus

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23 Transmitted to Governor
2019-04-23SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-04-23SenateSenate concurs
2019-04-23SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2019-04-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2019-04-17SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-04-17HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2019-04-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2019-03-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-18HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2019-03-18HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-12HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-25HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-25SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-14SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2019-02-05SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-04SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-04SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321123.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321124Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321125.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321126Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321127Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321127.01New CodeSee Bill Text
321131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321132.01New CodeSee Bill Text
321133New CodeSee Bill Text
321133.01New CodeSee Bill Text
321134Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321134.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321136Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
321137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321151.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321152Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321152.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321154Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321155.01Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
321156Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321156.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321162New CodeSee Bill Text
321165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321166Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
321166.01New CodeSee Bill Text
321166.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321167Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
321168Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321169Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321170.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321182Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321183Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321186Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321187Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321188Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72043
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1397p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1397s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1397h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1397mesnard.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1397com.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1397mesnard1055.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1397weninger.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.1397commerce.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72043&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72043&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72043&billStatusActionId=186652&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72043&billStatusActionId=186808&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72043&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72043&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72043&billStatusActionId=188626&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72043&billStatusActionId=189008&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72043&billStatusActionId=189010&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72043&billStatusActionId=189089&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72043&billStatusActionId=189098&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback