AZ SB1375 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Ballots; categories; count; identification number
Title
Ballots; categories; count; identification number
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - Motion (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-20 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-1-0-0) |
2024-02-29 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Ballot Designation Methods
Ballots
Categories
Conduct Of Elections
Count
Designated Margin
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Form And Contents Of Ballot
Hand Counts
Identification Number
Removal Of Ballots
Vote Count Verification Committee
Ballots
Categories
Conduct Of Elections
Count
Designated Margin
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Form And Contents Of Ballot
Hand Counts
Identification Number
Removal Of Ballots
Vote Count Verification Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 663 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |