AZ SB1375 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter 88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Contractor licensure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contractor licensure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateChapter 88
2018-03-27SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-22SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-21SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2018-03-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-03-06HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-15HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-15SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2018-02-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-02-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-05SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321151.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321154Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70519
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1375p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1375s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0088.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70519&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70519&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70519&billStatusActionId=180890&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70519&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70519&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70519&billStatusActionId=182580&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback