AZ SB1373 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Discussion Only, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Discussion Only, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; Maricopa community college district
Title
Appropriation; Maricopa community college district
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DISC/ONLY) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Discussion Only, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate HEWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HEWD Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Education
Maricopa County Community College District
Mcccd
Native Americans
Technical Education
Appropriation
Education
Maricopa County Community College District
Mcccd
Native Americans
Technical Education