AZ SB1366 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Chapter 162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Peace officer; victim; aggravating factor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peace officer; victim; aggravating factor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17SenateChapter 162
2017-04-17SenateGovernor Signed
2017-04-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-04-11SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (21-9-0-0)
2017-04-11SenateSenate concurs
2017-04-11SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2017-04-11SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2017-04-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-04-05HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (34-25-1-0)
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-03-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-21HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2017-03-15HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-23HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-20HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0)
2017-02-16SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-13SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-02-13SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-09SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2017-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
131204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13701Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69195
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1366p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1366s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1366h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0162.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1366floorsmith 1.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.1366farnsworth e.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.1366judiciary and public safety.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69195&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69195&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69195&billStatusActionId=175211&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69195&billStatusActionId=174903&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69195&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69195&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69195&billStatusActionId=176724&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69195&billStatusActionId=176855&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69195&billStatusActionId=176911&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69195&billStatusActionId=176915&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback