AZ SB1366 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-09 - Referred to House JUD Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-09 - Referred to House JUD Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Medical malpractice; liability waivers
Title
Medical malpractice; liability waivers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-09 | House read second time | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-28 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Senate HMLR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |