AZ SB1364 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-17 - Senate JUD Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-17 - Senate JUD Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; emergency interception
Title
Technical correction; emergency interception
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Held |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |