AZ SB1363 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Empowerment scholarship accounts; expansion; funding

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Empowerment scholarship accounts; expansion; funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-20 Governor Signed
2013-06-17 Transmitted to Governor
2013-06-13SenateSenate final reading , voting: (15-14-1-0)
2013-06-13SenateSenate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2013-06-05SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2013-06-05SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2013-06-04HouseTransmit to Senate
2013-06-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (34-19-7-0)
2013-06-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2013-04-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2013-04-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2013-04-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0)
2013-03-27HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2013-03-27HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-4-0-0-0)
2013-03-28HouseReferred to House APPROP Committee
2013-03-28HouseHouse read second time
2013-03-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2013-03-27HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2013-03-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2013-03-26SenateTransmit to House
2013-03-26SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-10-3-0)
2013-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2013-02-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2013-02-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2013-02-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2013-02-04SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2013-02-14SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0)
2013-02-05SenateReferred to Senate ED Committee
2013-02-05SenateSenate read second time
2013-02-04SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2013-02-04SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2013-02-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=110&Bill_Number=SB1363
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/sb1363p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/sb1363s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/sb1363h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/laws/0250.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/proposed/h.1363aq.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/adopted/h.1363-rules.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/sb1363.sed.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/sb1363.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/sb1363.happrop.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/sb1363.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/sb1363.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/sb1363.sfinal.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/sb1363.sfinal.2.asp

Bill Comments

feedback