AZ SB1355 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Developmental disabilities; provider increases
Title
Developmental disabilities; provider increases
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | House HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Department Of Economic Security
Developmental Disabilities
Intellectual Disabilities
Intent
Intent Clause
Legislative Intent (h)
Provider Increases
Provider Rate Increases
Reports
Appropriations
Department Of Economic Security
Developmental Disabilities
Intellectual Disabilities
Intent
Intent Clause
Legislative Intent (h)
Provider Increases
Provider Rate Increases
Reports