AZ SB1350 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Chapter 119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Chapter 119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Terrorist threats; false reports; terrorism
Title
Terrorist threats; false reports; terrorism
Sponsors
Sen. Warren Petersen [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Eddie Farnsworth [R] |
Rep. Travis Grantham [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 119 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0) |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | House | House JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 2301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 2308.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 2308.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 2308.03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 2925 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 902 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |