AZ SB1338 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Veteran special plates; branch seal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veteran special plates; branch seal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-18SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0)
2019-02-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-12SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-12SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-11SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-06SenateSenate TPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-02-04SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
282414Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71964
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1338p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1338s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.13380301.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1338tps.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1338carter0906.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71964&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71964&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71964&billStatusActionId=186566&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71964&billStatusActionId=186603&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback