AZ SB1325 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
First responder special plates
Title
First responder special plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to House TI Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-2-3-0) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |