AZ SB1324 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-22 - House third reading FAILED voting: (43-15-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-22 - House third reading FAILED voting: (43-15-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Smart and safe fund; distribution
Title
Smart and safe fund; distribution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (43-15-2-0) |
2022-06-20 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2022-06-06 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2022-06-06 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (40-13-7-0) |
2022-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-05-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-03-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-21 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-6-1-0-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adult Use Of Marijuana
Distribution
Distributions (h)
Marijuana
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Requirements For Enactment (rfe)
Requirements For Enactment, Initiative Or Referendum (rfeir) (h)
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote
Retroactivity
Rfe (see Also: Requirements For Enactment)
Rfeir (see Also: Requirements For Enactment, Initiative Or Referendum) (h)
Smart And Safe Fund
Three-fourths Vote
Distribution
Distributions (h)
Marijuana
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Requirements For Enactment (rfe)
Requirements For Enactment, Initiative Or Referendum (rfeir) (h)
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote
Retroactivity
Rfe (see Also: Requirements For Enactment)
Rfeir (see Also: Requirements For Enactment, Initiative Or Referendum) (h)
Smart And Safe Fund
Three-fourths Vote