AZ SB1324 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - House GOV Committee action: Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - House GOV Committee action: Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance coverage; legal; identity theft
Title
Insurance coverage; legal; identity theft
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | House GOV Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2010-03-16 | House read second time | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-08 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-08 | Senate third reading , voting: (19-9-2-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2010-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-18 | Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |