AZ SB1323 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-14 - Chapter 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-14 - Chapter 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vexatious litigants; workers' compensation
Title
Vexatious litigants; workers' compensation
Sponsors
Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] | Sen. John Kavanagh [R] | Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Sen. Susan Donahue [R] | Sen. Adam Driggs [R] | Sen. David Farnsworth [R] | Sen. Steve Smith [R] |
Sen. Bob Worsley [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | Chapter 26 | |
2016-03-14 | Governor Signed | |
2016-03-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-03-10 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-4-2-0) |
2016-03-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |