AZ SB1322 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter 58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter 58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Community colleges; expenditure limitation
Title
Community colleges; expenditure limitation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Chapter 58 | |
2016-03-24 | Governor Signed | |
2016-03-22 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-03-21 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-18-3-0) |
2016-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-2-0) |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2016-02-25 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-3-2-0) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |