AZ SB1317 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tribal airports; state aviation fund
Title
Tribal airports; state aviation fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Governor Signed | |
2013-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-06-14 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-06-14 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2013-04-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2013-04-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2013-03-21 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-1-0-0) |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to House TRANS Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate TRANS Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANS Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |