AZ SB1313 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Chapter 164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Chapter 164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DCS; discharge from care; housing
Title
DCS; discharge from care; housing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 164 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-04-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-15-1-0) |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-21 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-12 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-2-2-0) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate TTMC Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-2-0) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Child Placement (h)
Child Safety - Title 8
Child Welfare (h)
Child Welfare And Placement
Children - Title 8 (h)
Dcs (see Also: Department Of Child Safety)
Definition
Department Of Child Safety (dcs)
Discharge From Care (h)
Housing (h)
Leaving Care Of The Department
Legislative Intent
Report
Safe And Stable Housing
Young Adult
Child Safety - Title 8
Child Welfare (h)
Child Welfare And Placement
Children - Title 8 (h)
Dcs (see Also: Department Of Child Safety)
Definition
Department Of Child Safety (dcs)
Discharge From Care (h)
Housing (h)
Leaving Care Of The Department
Legislative Intent
Report
Safe And Stable Housing
Young Adult