AZ SB1313 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public health districts; voter approval
Title
Public health districts; voter approval
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | Senate final reading , voting: (37-20-3-0) | |
2011-04-18 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-18 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-15 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-14 | House third reading , voting: (38-18-4-0) | |
2011-04-11 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-06 | House Consent Calendar April 06, 2011 @ 4:45 PM with Objections | |
2011-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-07 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2011-03-07 | House read second time | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-02 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |