AZ SB1306 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House third reading FAILED voting: (29-30-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House third reading FAILED voting: (29-30-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; data privacy
Title
Schools; data privacy
Sponsors
Sen. Kelli Ward [R] | Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] | Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Carlyle Begay [R] |
Sen. David Bradley [D] | Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (29-30-1-0) |
2015-03-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |