AZ SB1305 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - House MAPS Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - House MAPS Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Game and fish omnibus act
Title
Game and fish omnibus act
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. Adam Driggs [R] | Rep. Russell Jones [R] | Rep. Terri Proud [R] |
Sen. Steve Smith [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] | Rep. Ted Vogt [R] | Sen. Steven Yarbrough [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | House MAPS Committee action: Held | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-03-08 | House read second time | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-03-05 | Transmit to House | |
2012-03-05 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-28 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-27 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-13 | Senate NRT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to Senate NRT Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate NRT Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |