AZ SB1302 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Referred to House JUD Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Referred to House JUD Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Real estate transfers; disclosures
Title
Real estate transfers; disclosures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2010-03-17 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0-0) | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2010-03-09 | House read second time | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-02-22 | Transmit to House | |
2010-02-22 | Senate third reading , voting: (25-5-0-0) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-02-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-15 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Senate CED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |