AZ SB1298 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to House HEALTH Committee
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to House HEALTH Committee
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
AHCCCS; emergency services; case management
Title
AHCCCS; emergency services; case management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2014-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-10-1-0) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |