AZ SB1296 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Chapter 141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Chapter 141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Collegiate athletics; compensation
Title
Collegiate athletics; compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Senate | Chapter 141 |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-7-0-0) |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-03-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-09 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Collegiate Athletics
Compensation
Definitions
Education - Title 15
Postsecondary Institutions
Student Athletes
Compensation
Definitions
Education - Title 15
Postsecondary Institutions
Student Athletes