AZ SB1295 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Business development program; disabled persons
Title
Business development program; disabled persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-07 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2010-03-16 | House read second time | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-01 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-7-1-0) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate Consent Calendar February 15, 2010 @ 2:25 PM | |
2010-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-15 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Senate CED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0) | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Assigned to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |