AZ SB1293 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans' organizations; solicitations
Title
Veterans' organizations; solicitations
Sponsors
Sen. John Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Military and Government Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Military and Government Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Governor Signed | |
2012-03-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-08 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-08 | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0) | |
2012-03-05 | House Consent Calendar March 05, 2012 @ 1:39 PM | |
2012-03-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-05 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-29 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-02-28 | House read second time | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-23 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-23 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Consent Calendar February 13, 2012 @ 1:30 PM | |
2012-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-14 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-13 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Senate VMGA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to Senate VMGA Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate VMGA Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |