AZ SB1292 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
EORP; cost-of-living adjustment
Title
EORP; cost-of-living adjustment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | House BI Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to House BI Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Cost-of-living Adjustment
Elected Officials' Retirement Plan
Eorp
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Elected Officials' Retirement Plan
Eorp
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 818 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 818.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 818.02 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 818.03 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 818.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 819 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |