AZ SB1291 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Chapter 195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Chapter 195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Conservatorship; guardianship; policies; procedures
Title
Conservatorship; guardianship; policies; procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House - Motion Representative Livingston motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), SB1291 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for the purpose of amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-09 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House - Motion Representative Livingston motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), SB1291 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for the purpose of amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-09 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Chapter 195 |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-05-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-2-0) |
2023-05-15 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-05-15 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2023-05-09 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2023-05-09 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (26-29-4-0) |
2023-05-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-04-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2023-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2023-04-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-29 | House | House JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2023-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-03-02 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-7-2-0) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Conservator
Conservatorship
Contact Orders
Contempt (h)
Definitions
Duties Of Appointed Attorney (h)
Fingerprinting
Guardianship
Maintaining Ward's Relationships
Method Of Payment
Notice
Notices In Guardianship Proceedings
Obligations (h)
Original Petition
Policies
Powers And Duties
Priorities
Procedures
Protection Of Persons Under Disability And Their Property
Protective Order
Protective Proceeding
Purpose (h)
Rights (h)
Supported Decision-making (h)
Time Of Giving
Trusts, Estates And Protective Proceedings - Title 14
Who May Be Guardian
Conservatorship
Contact Orders
Contempt (h)
Definitions
Duties Of Appointed Attorney (h)
Fingerprinting
Guardianship
Maintaining Ward's Relationships
Method Of Payment
Notice
Notices In Guardianship Proceedings
Obligations (h)
Original Petition
Policies
Powers And Duties
Priorities
Procedures
Protection Of Persons Under Disability And Their Property
Protective Order
Protective Proceeding
Purpose (h)
Rights (h)
Supported Decision-making (h)
Time Of Giving
Trusts, Estates And Protective Proceedings - Title 14
Who May Be Guardian
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | 1102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 1201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 1306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 1401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 5111 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 5303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 5309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 5316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 5401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 5404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 5405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 5407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |