AZ SB1285 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Vetoed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Job training; stipends; STEM; internships
Title
Job training; stipends; STEM; internships
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Rural and Economic Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Rural and Economic Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | Governor Vetoed | |
2015-03-31 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-11-1-0) |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | House RED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred to House RED Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RED Committee |
2015-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |