AZ SB1277 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Board of supervisors; membership
Title
Board of supervisors; membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Board Of Supervisors
Counties - Title 11
County Board Of Supervisors
Membership
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Counties - Title 11
County Board Of Supervisors
Membership
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 5105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |