AZ SB1271 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 336
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 336
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Construction liability; apportionment; study
Title
Construction liability; apportionment; study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 336 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0) |
2018-04-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-04-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-03-20 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2018-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Construction Professional
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Dwelling Action
Strike Everything Amendment
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Dwelling Action
Strike Everything Amendment