AZ SB1269 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Veterinarian board
Title
Veterinarian board
Sponsors
Sen. John Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-12 | House third reading , voting: (42-17-1-0) | |
2011-04-06 | House Consent Calendar April 06, 2011 @ 4:45 PM | |
2011-04-07 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-07 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-10 | House AW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to House AW Committee | |
2011-03-07 | House read second time | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House AW Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-28 | Senate third reading , voting: (27-2-1-0) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Senate NRT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-27 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Assigned to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |