AZ SB1267 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Chapter 300
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Chapter 300
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property; classification; primary residence
Title
Property; classification; primary residence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | Chapter 300 |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-06-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-0-12-0) |
2022-06-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-07 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 12003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 12004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 12052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 12054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 13302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 16002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 19157 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |